Payne v. Sheeley et al
Petitioner: Christopher Nelson Payne
Respondent: John Sheeley and Lawson
Case Number: 5:2020cv00040
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss #12 and DISMISSES the petition WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/17/2020. (copy to pro se Petitioner via CM/rrr)(ag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Nelson Payne. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/4/20. (ag)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART PETITIONERS MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File; #7 Motion for appointment of counsel. Petitioner shall have 21 days from entry of this Order to file his petition and either pay the $5 filing fee or complete the application in forma pauperis and submit a Prisoner Trust Account Report with ledger sheets. Failure to comply will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 4/1/2020. (copy to pro se Petitioner by cm/rrr)(ag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag). Modified on 4/8/2020 (ag).
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 Mail sent to Christopher Nelson Payne #8 Letter Returned as Undeliverable. (ag)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S LETTER to Christopher Nelson Payne responding to #7 MOTION. (1983 Form sent) (lmm)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND APPOINT COUNSEL by Christopher Nelson Payne. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (1983 Form sent) (lmm)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Amended Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/4/20. (lmm)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice #2 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/29/20. (lmm)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #3 Notice. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 2254 Packet) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Lawson, John Sheeley, filed by Christopher Nelson Payne. (Attachments: #1 Warrant for Arrest, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Sheeley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Sheeley
Represented By: Karen C. Villanueva-Matkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Nelson Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?