Metheney v. Deepwell Energy Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donald E. Metheney
Defendant: Tug Hill Operating, LLC, John Doe, Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation and Deepwell Energy Services, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Group Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00054
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Group Management Services, Inc. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Planinsic, Holly)
May 14, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deepwell Energy Services, LLC Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (Konrad, Angela)
May 14, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald E. Metheney Plaintiff's Initial Discovery Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Pearl, Kevin)
May 14, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tug Hill Operating, LLC Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Butler, David)
May 13, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deepwell Energy Services, LLC Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Donald E. Metheney and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff, Donald E. Metheney. (Konrad, Angela)
May 7, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #10 Intervenor Complaint by Donald E. Metheney.(Pearl, Kevin)
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 Defendant Deepwell Energy Services, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint for Subrogation by Group Management Services, Inc. by Deepwell Energy Services, LLC.(Konrad, Angela)
May 5, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald E. Metheney Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Tug Hill Operating, LLC. (Pearl, Kevin)
May 5, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald E. Metheney Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Deepwell Energy Services, LLC (Pearl, Kevin)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tug Hill Operating, LLC First Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Group Management Services, Inc.. (Butler, David)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant Tug Hill Operating, LLC's ANSWER to #10 Complaint for Subrogation of Group Management Services, Inc. by Tug Hill Operating, LLC.(Butler, David)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING GROUP MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.'S #8 MOTION TO INTERVENE AS PLAINTIFF. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/30/20. (lmm)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ullman. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/22/20. (lmm)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 PHV Filing fee for Attorney Ullman: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002428 (lmm)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Group Management Services. (Planinsic, Holly)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 Intervenor COMPLAINT for Subrogation Pursuant to O.R.C. 4123.93 and.931, filed by Group Management Services.(Planinsic, Holly)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Intervene as a Plaintiff filed by Group Management Services. (Planinsic, Holly)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene as a Plaintiff by Group Management Services. (Planinsic, Holly)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tug Hill Operating, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff Donald E. Metheney. (Butler, David)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder & Amendments due by 8/3/2021. Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Motions due by 7/18/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2021 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 9/21/2021 09:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/27/20. (lmm)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Butler, David)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tug Hill Operating, LLC. (Butler, David)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tug Hill Operating, LLC First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Donald E. Metheney. (Butler, David)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 4/16/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/30/2020. Discovery due by 5/14/2020. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/19/20. (lmm) Modified on 3/19/2020 REGEN NEF to counsel added (lmm).
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Wetzel County, (case number 19-C-82), filed by Tug Hill Operating, LLC. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-3011924. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - THO's Answer, #4 Exhibit D - Deepwell's Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Consent, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) Modified on 3/19/2020 to REGEN NEF to counsel added(lmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metheney v. Deepwell Energy Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tug Hill Operating, LLC
Represented By: David L. T. Butler
Represented By: Brian J. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwell Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Angela W. Konrad
Represented By: Alex M. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E. Metheney
Represented By: Kevin M. Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Group Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Meredith L. Ullman
Represented By: Holly Suzanne Planinsic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?