Harris v. Antonelli
Petitioner: Alonzo Horace Harris
Respondent: Bryan M. Antonelli
Case Number: 5:2020cv00055
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number WVNC002903. (ag)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk to Alonzo Harris responding to #7 his Letter regarding $5.00 filing fee. (nmm)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER from Alonzo Harris to Clerk regarding $5.00 filing fee and appropriate place to send check. (Attachments: #1 Example of BP 199 Form, #2 Envelope)(nmm)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Alonzo Horace Harris. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheet, #2 Envelope)(nmm)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alonzo Horace Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT and #3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/23/2020 (per usps website). (nmm)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Attachment B &C of 2241 Form) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Bryan M. Antonelli, filed by Alonzo Horace Harris. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan M. Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alonzo Horace Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?