Miller v. EM1 Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Regina Miller
Defendant: EM1 Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00056
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER. Joinder & Amendments due by 8/3/2020. Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Motions due by 4/16/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/22/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2021 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 8/24/2021 09:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/23/20. (lmm)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wyant, David)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 4/20/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/4/2020. Discovery due by 5/18/2020. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/23/20. (lmm)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by EM1 Services, LLC.(Wyant, David)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marshall County, (case number 20-C-15), filed by EM1 Services, LLC. $400.00 fee paid. Receipt #0424-3012581. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B- PA Department of State Business Entity Details, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Filing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. EM1 Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EM1 Services, LLC
Represented By: David L. Wyant
Represented By: Thomas E. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Miller
Represented By: Paul L. Frampton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?