Lanham v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Rosalee Lanham
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2020cv00060
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attorney General Summons Returned, #2 US Attorney NDWV Summons Returned)(ag)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin K. Reisenweber on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration (Reisenweber, Erin)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 3/27/20. (ag)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rosalee Lanham. (ag)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Social Security Administration, filed by Rosalee Lanham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 incomplete Summons deleted, replaced with #3 Proposed Summons) Modified on 3/27/2020 (ag).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanham v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Erin K. Reisenweber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalee Lanham
Represented By: Jan Dils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?