Dorfner v. McKinley & Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gregg P Dorfner
Defendant: Darren S Duskey, Ernest Dellatorre, Tim E Mizer and McKinley & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00075
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION re #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Response to Motion to Dismiss of Defendant McKinley, #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Trustees FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY/RESPONSE by Ernest Dellatorre, Darren S Duskey, Tim E Mizer. (Presley, Marla)
June 9, 2020 Filing 21 PHV Filing fee for Resnick and Fuller: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002948. (ag)
June 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Response to Motion to Dismiss of Defendant McKinley by Gregg P Dorfner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Delk, David)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Trustees by Gregg P Dorfner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Delk, David)
June 4, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John C. Fuller by McKinley & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hansberry, John)
June 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie Resnick by McKinley & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hansberry, John)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Resnick and Fuller (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
May 25, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKinley & Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Willow Glen Capital for McKinley & Associates, Inc... (Hansberry, John)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS by McKinley & Associates, Inc. re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Hansberry, John)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by McKinley & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hansberry, John)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of by Ernest Dellatorre, Darren S Duskey, Tim E Mizer re #11 MOTION to Dismiss . (Presley, Marla)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Ernest Dellatorre, Darren S Duskey, Tim E Mizer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Presley, Marla)
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Rene Thorne and Juan Obregon: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002432 (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION: Attorney Presley erroneously added herself as counsel for Defendant McKinley & Associates, Inc. when filing #2 Application for Pro Hac Vice; Deputy Clerk corrected the docket and docket entries to reflect such changes. (nmm)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Juan C. Obregon. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 4/24/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rene E. Thorne Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 4/24/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ernest Dellatorre, Darren S Duskey, Tim E Mizer. (Presley, Marla) Modified docket text as to correct filers on 4/24/2020 (nmm).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER: this civil action is hereby ORDERED TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Thomas S. Kleeh. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/17/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Juan C. Obregon by Ernest Dellatorre, Darren S Duskey, Tim E Mizer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Presley, Marla) Modified docket text as to correct filers on 4/24/2020 (nmm).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 5/14/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/28/2020; Initial Disclosures due by 6/11/2020. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/16/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rene E. Throne by Ernest Dellatorre, Darren S Duskey, Tim E Mizer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Presley, Marla) Modified docket text as to correct filers on 4/24/2020 (nmm).
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, West Virginia (case number 20-C-65) filed by Ernest Dellatorre, Tim E Mizer, and Darren S Duskey. Filing Fee $400 Receipt #0424-3025874 paid 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- State Court Summos, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Filing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorfner v. McKinley & Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg P Dorfner
Represented By: David L. Delk, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren S Duskey
Represented By: Marla N Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Dellatorre
Represented By: Marla N Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim E Mizer
Represented By: Marla N Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinley & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Marla N Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?