Clark v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Petitioner: Jha'Vaughn W. Clark
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 5:2020cv00105
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/22/2020. (nmm)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS: the Court ORDERS that this action is hereby DISMISSED, and all matters relating to the petition shall proceed in Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-97. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/17/2020. (copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/8/2020. (nmm)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2020: #1 2241 Packet) (nmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Federal Bureau of Prisons, filed by Jha'Vaughn W. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm) Modified filed date on 6/3/2020 (nmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jha'Vaughn W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?