Cohen v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Cohen
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv00152
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion. The plaintiff shall have twenty-one days from service of this Order to remit payment of $400. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/25/20. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend #10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Jeffrey Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Clerk's Judgment #10 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/21/20. (lmm)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court on 8/18/20. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Report and Recommendation should be, and is, hereby ORDERED ADOPTED for the reasons more fully stated in the magistrate judge's report. Accordingly, this Court ORDERS that plaintiff's #1 Federal Torts Claim Act Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Further, plaintiff's #2 Motion To Proceed in forma pauperis is hereby DENIED. This Court further DIRECTS the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of the defendants and to STRIKE this case from the active docket of this Court. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/18/20. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Jeffrey Cohen to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/5/20. (lmm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT and #5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/2/2020. (nmm)
August 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone no longer assigned to case pursuant to #6 Report and Recommendation. (lmm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The undersigned recommends the plaintiff's case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), and his pending #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED. The undersigned further recommends that the plaintiff be advised that if he wishes to pursue the allegations raised in the instant complaint, he must refile the complaint with payment of the $400 filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the Magistrate Judge association with this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 8/3/20. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Attach. C to FTCA Form) (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jeffrey Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Jeffrey Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cohen Declaration #1, #2 Exhibit B - Cohen Declaration #2, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?