Smith, Jr. v. Sines et al
Plaintiff: Richard A. Smith, Jr.
Defendant: CO Sines, CO John Doe No. 2 and CO John Doe No. 1
Case Number: 5:2020cv00154
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number WVNW002559 (lmm)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. The Trustee Officer shall automatically make monthly assessments upon the plaintiff's trust account of 20% of the preceding month's income toward the filing fee and shall forward such assessments to the Financial Deputy Clerk in the form of a check or money order at the above mentioned address each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00, until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 9/24/20. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr; Trustee and F. Deputy via email and US Mail w/Consent to Collection) (lmm) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/24/2020 to correct error) (lmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 SUBJECT-ARRANGED PAYMENT FOR PENDING CASE by Richard A. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION To Proceed With Speed by Richard A. Smith, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/27/20. (lmm)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Plaintiff regarding guidance in order to respond to #9 Order on Motion. (Attachments: #1 7/21/20 Email from FCI Trust Fund, #2 7/20/20 Email from FCI Trust Fund, #3 Envelope)(lmm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING THE PLAINTIFF AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING regarding #7 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 8/25/20. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard A. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Freedom of Information Act Request to Mon Health Medical Center, #2 Freedom of Information Act Request to FCI Hazelton, #3 Envelope)(lmm)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File attachment C & D of Bivens Form by Richard A. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice #4 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/5/20. (lmm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Att. C&D of Bivens Form) (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Incomplete Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Richard A. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard A. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard A. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2020: #4 Administrative Remedies) (lmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith, Jr. v. Sines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Sines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO John Doe No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO John Doe No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?