Doss v. Antonelli
Petitioner: Preston W. Doss
Respondent: Bryan Antonelli
Case Number: 5:2020cv00174
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/25/20. (lmm)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. The petitioner refiled his petition on the Court-approved form, and it was assigned Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-182. The terms of the Notice, the Court ORDERS that this action is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/23/20. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 2241 Packet) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus/Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel against Bryan Antonelli, filed by Preston W. Doss. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doss v. Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Preston W. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?