Shepard v. Adams
Petitioner: Anthony Antonio Shepard
Respondent: Paul Adams
Case Number: 5:2020cv00183
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/3/2020 (per usps website). (nmm)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; petitioners #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/1/2020. (copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony Antonio Shepard (address did not change and is current in cm/ecf) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/26/2020. (nmm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony Antonio Shepard (address is current) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Anthony Antonio Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(nmm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Antonio Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Paul Adams, filed by Anthony Antonio Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepard v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Antonio Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?