Cole v. Warden Adams et al
Plaintiff: Cecile M. Cole
Defendant: Captain Squires, Captain Perez, SIA Cooper, Warden Adams, Captain Asher and Counselor Ware
Case Number: 5:2020cv00187
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Cecile M. Cole (address updated in cm/ecf) and request that forms be resent for completion at new facility ([5-1] Forms sent via us mail this same day) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT and #5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/31/2020. (nmm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Bivens Form) (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2020 to attach correct form) (nmm).
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Cecile M. Cole. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cecile M. Cole. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cecile M. Cole. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Warden Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIA Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecile M. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?