Quinones-Cedeno v. Antonelli et al
Plaintiff: Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno
Defendant: E. Garcia, Paul Adams, Ms. M. Thompkis, Ms. J. Ridenour, M.B. Antonelli and Ms. M. Bluemling
Case Number: 5:2020cv00198
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION FOR CONSIDERATION TO ORDER AN INJUNCTION. STATEMENT OF CASE. by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff, #2 Letters to the Office of the Inspector General, #3 1/15/15 Administrative Remedy, #4 1/15/15 Administrative Remedy, #5 8/4/20 Rejection Notice, #6 Motion filed in 5:20-cv-50, #7 Affidavit filed in 1:19-cv-64, #8 Motion of IFP, #9 Envelope)(lmm)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. Per USPS SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/5/2020. (ag)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRUST REPORT AND LEDGER SHEETS. The plaintiff must file his ledger sheets by 11/02/2020. The Clerk is directed to send the plaintiff a blank PTAR which he must have completed and filed with his ledger sheets. Failure to comply with this order will result in the complaint being dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 10/1/2020. (ag)(copy to pro se Plaintiff with blank PTAR CM rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2020: #2 blank PTAR) (ag).
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION FOR EXTENTION OF TIME to provide Ledger Sheets by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Request Staff, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Notice #6 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/20 per USPS. (lmm)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/10/2020 to replace w correct form) (lmm).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones-Cedeno v. Antonelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. M. Thompkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. J. Ridenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.B. Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. M. Bluemling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?