Lewis v. Warden
Petitioner: Tonia L. Lewis
Respondent: Warden M. E. Reherman and Warden
Case Number: 5:2020cv00199
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 2241 Packet) (copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00581. (nmm)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: The proper respondent is Petitioner's custodian at the time of filing the petition. Here, that is the Warden of the Secure Female Facility Hazelton, where Petitioner is presently incarcerated. The undersigned FINDS that it is in the interest of justice that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (Clarksburg Division) and this matter is transferred to said court for additional proceedings. Petitioner is directed to address any further information concerning this matter to that court, including making the appropriate payment or filing the appropriate Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs in the transferee court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 9/11/2020. (cc: Petitioner) (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/15/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/15/2020.]
September 8, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/15/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee (slr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/15/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Tonia L. Lewis against M. E. Reherman pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (slr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden M. E. Reherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tonia L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?