Walton v. Shiflet et al
Plaintiff: Tony J. Walton
Defendant: Tom Harlem, Rick Haddix, Brian Shiflet, Michale Jackson and Jessica Sweaker
Case Number: 5:2020cv00205
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/9/2020. (nmm)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS: denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. All matters relating to the complaint shall proceed in Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-191. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/7/2020. (ag)(copy to pro se Plaintiff CM rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/23/2020. (nmm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 1983 packet) (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tony J. Walton. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(nmm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Tony J. Walton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony J. Walton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tony J. Walton. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Tony Walton, #2 Grievance Forms, #3 Envelope)(nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. Shiflet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Harlem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Haddix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Shiflet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michale Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Sweaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony J. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?