Mey v. ADT, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diana Mey
Defendant: ADT, Inc., Safe Streets USA, LLC and Perfectvision Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00209
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Protective Order by Perfectvision Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Manning, Jacob)
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Mey for Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests to PerfectVision Manufacturing, Inc.. (Barrett, John)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE DISCOVERY REQUESTS PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE, WITH REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION: the Court grants the #10 Motion. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/12/2020. (nmm)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Edward A. Broderick: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002609 (nmm)
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward A. Broderick by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, John)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Serve Discovery Requests Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, With Request for Expedited Consideration by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Barrett, John)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Perfectvision Manufacturing, Inc. served on 11/4/2020. (nmm)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew McCue. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/3/2020. (nmm)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Matthew McCue: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002594 (nmm)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew P. McCue by Diana Mey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Diana Mey. Safe Streets USA, LLC waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Barrett, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Diana Mey. ADT, Inc. waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Barrett, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorney Edward A. Broderick and Matthew P. McCue. (nmm)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Diana Mey. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3124470 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mey v. ADT, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Streets USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfectvision Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Mey
Represented By: Edward A. Broderick
Represented By: Matthew P McCue
Represented By: Jonathan R Marshall
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Sharon F. Iskra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?