Tippins v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Frances Tippins
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00244
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Defendant's Initial Discovery Disclosures. (Durst, Tiffany)
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frances Tippins PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL RULE 26(a)(1) DISCLOSURES (Blass, Scott)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frances Tippins Plaintiff's Amended Rule 30(b) Notice of Videotaped Deposition. (Blass, Scott)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frances Tippins Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Chleaon Johnson. (Blass, Scott)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Selep on behalf of Frances Tippins (Selep, Justin)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder & Amendments due by 2/11/2021; Discovery due by 8/31/2021; Motions due by 9/20/2021; Responses due by 10/8/2021; Replies due by 10/22/2021; Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/3/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2021 2:00 PM in Wheeling, WV; Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 1/11/2022 9:00 AM in Wheeling, WV. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/8/2020. (ag)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scheduling Order Checklist)(Blass, Scott)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Durst, Tiffany)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 12/15/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/29/2020. Discovery due by 1/12/2021. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/17/20. (lmm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet Other Document re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Durst, Tiffany)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Tyler County, (case number 20-C-34), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Filing fee $400 PAID - Receipt #0424-3156135. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice, #5 Blank Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tippins v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany R. Durst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Tippins
Represented By: Erica A. Conti
Represented By: Scott S. Blass
Represented By: Justin J. Selep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?