Price v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Sean Price
Defendant: Officer M. Martin and Warden - FCI Hazelton
Case Number: 5:2020cv00252
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 Mail sent to Sean Price #9 Order Returned as Undeliverable. (lmm)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. Your item departed our USPS facility in PITTSBURGH PA DISTRIBUTION CENTER on January 25, 2021 at 1:37 pm. The item is currently in transit to the destination per USPS. (lmm)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. It is hereby ORDERED that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the plaintiff's pending #3 #4 motions be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/15/21. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO REFILE IN PENCIL BUT DENYING HIS REQUEST TO FILE WITHOUT COURT APPROVED FORMS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/21/2020 (per usps website). (nmm)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/14/20 per USPS. (lmm)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO REFILE IN PENCIL BUT DENYING HIS REQUEST TO FILE WITHOUT COURT APPROVED FORMS regarding #2 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/17/20. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Bivens Packet)(Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IN THE ENCLOSED PETITION by Sean Price. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION FOR ORDER OF PROTECTION AGAINST OFFICER M. MARTIN AT FCI HAZELTON by Sean Price. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION REQUESTING LEAVE TO FILE ENCLOSED DOCUMENTS IN PENCIL WITHOUT COURT APPROVED FORMS DUE TO SHU HOUSING AND SEVERITY OF CLAIM(S). by Sean Price. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M. Martin, Warden - FCI Hazelton, filed by Sean Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1 - Medical Record, #3 Exhibit 2 - Medical Record, #4 Exhibit 3 - Medical Record, #5 Exhibit 4 - Medical Duty Status, #6 Exhibit 5 - Medical Record, #7 Exhibit 6 - Medical Record, #8 Cover Letter, #9 Envelope) (certain exhibits sealed per J. Bailey) (lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden - FCI Hazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?