Cross et al v. Cam Safety, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rancel Jeramy Cross and Rachel Cross
Defendant: Profrac Services, LLC, John Doe 2, Cam Safety, LLC, EQT Corporation, John Doe 1 and Botha Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00012
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Rancel Jeramy Cross(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(McCabe, Christopher)
March 17, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Profrac Services LLC by Botha Trucking, LLC.(Leety, James)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SUBMIT SCHEDULING ORDER CHECKLIST. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/15/21. (lmm)
March 12, 2021 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kuratomi, Nathanial)
February 26, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Profrac Services, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Rachel Cross, individually. (Matthews, Gary)
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Profrac Services, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Rancel Cross, individually. (Matthews, Gary)
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Profrac Services, LLC First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Rancel Cross, as Natural Guardian of S.C., T.C. and L.C.. (Matthews, Gary)
February 19, 2021 Filing 15 ProFrac Services, LLC's ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of EQT Corporation by Profrac Services, LLC.(Kuratomi, Nathanial)
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Botha Trucking, LLC. (Leety, James)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Response to Crossclaim by Botha Trucking, LLC. (Leety, James)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Profrac Services, LLC. (Kuratomi, Nathanial)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 Profrac Services, LLC ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Botha Trucking, LLC by Profrac Services, LLC.(Matthews, Gary)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Matthew A. Nelson. (ag)
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and EQT Corporation's Cross-Claim by Botha Trucking, LLC.(Leety, James)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQT Corporation. (Hicks, Jennifer)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time for Profrac Services, LLC to Answer Complaint by Profrac Services, LLC. (Matthews, Gary)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint - Amended Answer and Crossclaims of EQT Corporation -, CROSSCLAIM against Botha Trucking, LLC, Cam Safety, LLC, Profrac Services, LLC by EQT Corporation.(Hicks, Jennifer)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 2/26/2021; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/12/2021; Initial Disclosures due by 3/26/2021. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/29/2021. (ag)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint - Answer and Crossclaims of EQT Corporation -, CROSSCLAIM against Botha Trucking, LLC, Cam Safety, LLC, Profrac Services, LLC by EQT Corporation.(Hicks, Jennifer)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION Extending Time for Profrac Services, LLC to Answer Complaint by Profrac Services, LLC. (Kuratomi, Nathanial)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Alan Matthews on behalf of Profrac Services, LLC (Matthews, Gary)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Wetzel County, (case number 20-C-55), filed by EQT Corporation, Profrac Services, LLC. Filing Fee $402.00 Receipt #0424-3191192. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wetzel County docket sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit 3 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #4 Exhibit 4 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #5 Exhibit 5 - Documents from WV Secretary of State, #6 Exhibit 6 - 1/22/21 Email, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross et al v. Cam Safety, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rancel Jeramy Cross
Represented By: Christopher J. McCabe
Represented By: Scott S. Blass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Cross
Represented By: Christopher J. McCabe
Represented By: Scott S. Blass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Profrac Services, LLC
Represented By: Nathanial A Kuratomi
Represented By: Gary Alan Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cam Safety, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQT Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Jo Hicks
Represented By: Tiffany Marie Arbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Botha Trucking, LLC
Represented By: James M. Leety
Represented By: Matthew A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?