Jennings v. Case Manager Yonash et al
Petitioner: Brandon Marquis Jennings
Respondent: P. McKone, F-2 Counselor Jorge, Case Manager Yonash and P. Adams
Case Number: 5:2021cv00014
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order #12 Clerk's Judgment. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/1/21 per USPS. (lmm)
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/23/21. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The #9 Motion is DENIED. Petitioner's #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 is hereby DENIED and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is hereby DENIED and the fee waived. This Court further ORDERS that this matter be STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court and DIRECTS the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of respondent. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/23/21. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER from Deputy Clerk of Court to Brandon Marquis Jennings in response to [9-1] Letter filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings requesting FRCP. (kac)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARILY DISMISSAL AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND SEAL by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (2241 Form sent via US Mail) (lmm)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/5/2021. (ag)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice #4 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/29/21. (lmm)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is the undersigned's recommendation that this #1 2241 petition be DENIED and DISMISSED without prejudice to the petitioner's right to file his claims in a civil rights action. In addition, the undersigned recommends that his #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED and the fee waived. The Clerk is directed to terminate the Magistrate Judges association with this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 2/2/21. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr w/Bivens packet) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone no longer assigned to case pursuant to #6 Report and Recommendation. (lmm)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Case Manager Yonash, F-2 Counselor Jorge, P. McKone, P. Adams, filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. Case Manager Yonash et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. McKone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F-2 Counselor Jorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Case Manager Yonash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon Marquis Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?