Pennington Bey v. Hudgins et al
Plaintiff: Maurice D. Pennington Bey
Defendant: Mr. Y. Hong, Robert Hudgins and M. Wilson
Case Number: 5:2021cv00061
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order Dismissing Case. Per USPS SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/7/2021. (ag)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This Court finds special factors that counsel hesitation before expanding the Bivens remedy, Mr. Pennington-Bey's attempt to extend the Bivens remedy to his claim that the defendants violated his First Amendment rights must be rejected. Because there remains no cognizable cause of action, this case is dismissed. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/4/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA CM rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/26/2021. (ag)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE. (ag)(pro se PLA CM rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Maurice D. Pennington Bey. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(ag)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Maurice D. Pennington Bey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maurice D. Pennington Bey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Y. Hong, Robert Hudgins, M. Wilson filed by Maurice D. Pennington Bey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A1 - A14, #2 Sworn Affidavit of Charles Loftly, #3 Exhibit Supporting Facts for Claim 1, #4 Envelope)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington Bey v. Hudgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Y. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice D. Pennington Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?