Lamp, Jr. v. Jividen et al
Plaintiff: Charles Earl Lamp, Jr.
Defendant: Dale Griffith, Pam Moore, Shawn Straughn, Betsy Jividen, James Gray and Dr. Patel, Wexford Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00082
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVND e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after July 19, 2021. Instructions for linking your account can be found #here. PLEASE NOTE: The WVND CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 1:00 pm on Friday July 16, 2021 until 8:00 am Monday, July 19, 2021. An extension for electronic filing will be granted for all documents with court-imposed deadlines falling between 1:00 pm on Friday, July 16, 2021, and midnight on Sunday, July 18, 2021. All documents due during that period must be filed prior to 1:00 pm Friday, July 16, 2021, or on Monday, July 19, 2021. If you have any additional questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
June 19, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM?ECF system to Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen Cm/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have thei r own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVND e-fling account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after July 19, 2021. Please log in to the WVND CM/ECF system at https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/ before July 19, 2021 to make sure you know your current WVND e-filing login and password. Do not rely on your username and password being saved in your web browser, because that method will not work with the NextGen upgrade. If you do not know your login or password or have any additional questions please call the WVND Clerks CM/ECF Office Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 TABLE OF CONTENTS re #1 Complaint filed by Charles Earl Lamp, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Chronology of Events, #4 Exhausted Grievance Procedures, #5 Medical Records, #6 Inmate Medical Service Request Forms, #7 Medication Record, #8 Medical Records, #9 Notice of Claim, #10 Copy of Prisoner Trust Account Report, #11 Certificate of Service, #12 Note from Plaintiff, #13 Envelope)(lmm)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/2/21. (lmm)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles Earl Lamp, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Charles Earl Lamp, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Earl Lamp, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Earl Lamp, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Medical, #4 Notice of Claim, #5 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamp, Jr. v. Jividen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Straughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Jividen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Patel, Wexford Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Earl Lamp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?