Tye v. Bowers
Petitioner: Christopher Michael Tye
Respondent: F.J. Bowers
Case Number: 5:2021cv00138
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/13/21. (lmm)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/12/21. (lmm)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Petitioner's #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The court DENIES a certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/10/21. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC003283 (lmm)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against F.J. Bowers, filed by Christopher Michael Tye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 4/13/21 Memo, #2 Exhibit B - Letter, #3 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tye v. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Michael Tye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F.J. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?