Flynn v. Comfort Inn et al
Plaintiff: Kelsie Flynn
Defendant: Comfort Inn, Dpty Walter Lesnett and Stephanie Stewart
Case Number: 5:2021cv00146
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on PER USPS Status not available at this time 9/3/2021 11:47am. (ag)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: the Court finds this case should be, and hereby is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; The Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #8 #2 are hereby DENIED AS MOOT and the fee waived. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/25/2021. (ag)(pro se PLA cm rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 ** SEALED** AMENDED/UPDATED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelsie Flynn. (Attachments: #1 Updates to Cases)(nmm)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Plaintiff requesting damages and a jury trial. (lmm)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice of General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/23/2021. (ag)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelsie Flynn. (address updated) (lmm)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelsie Flynn. (lmm)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelsie Flynn. (lmm)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kelsie Flynn. (Attachments: #1 Criminal Bail Agreement, #2 Ciatation, #3 Court Disposition Reporting, #4 Initial Appearance, #5 Criminal Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2021: #7 Order, #8 Proposed Summons) (lmm). Modified on 8/23/2021 to seal certain exhibits per J. Bailey and to add document. NEF REGEN. (lmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flynn v. Comfort Inn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsie Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dpty Walter Lesnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?