Wills v. Pszczolkowski
Petitioner: Johnnie Franklin Wills
Respondent: Karen Pszczolkowski
Case Number: 5:2022cv00005
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Johnnie Franklin Wills. (Cooper, Jeremy)
February 4, 2022 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Karen Pszczolkowski. (Niday, Mary)
February 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Karen Pszczolkowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Niday, Mary)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Attorney Mary Beth Niday substituted for Attorney Katherine Marie Smith. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/20/2022. (nmm)
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Karen Pszczolkowski of Substitution of Counsel (Niday, Mary) Modified event type to show as pending motion on 1/19/2022 ; NEF Regenerated (nmm).
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie Smith on behalf of Karen Pszczolkowski (Smith, Katherine)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE PETITION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED: the respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition within twenty-eight (28) days from the date of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 1/7/2022. (copy to counsel for respondent w/ #1 Petition via us mail) (nmm)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Karen Pszczolkowski, filed by Johnnie Franklin Wills. Filing Fee $5.00; Receipt # BWVNDC-3399632. (Attachments: #1 Appendix SCAWV habeas appeal decision, #2 Appendix Petitioner's Brief in state habeas appeal, #3 Appendix Petitioner's Reply Brief in state habeas appeal, #4 Appendix Circuit Court order denying habeas relief, #5 Appendix SCAWV direct appeal decision, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wills v. Pszczolkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnnie Franklin Wills
Represented By: Jeremy Benjamin Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Karen Pszczolkowski
Represented By: Karen Villanueva-Matkovich
Represented By: Mary Beth Niday
Represented By: Katherine Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?