Stutler v. Beard
Petitioner: Aric Stutler
Respondent: Warden Beard
Case Number: 5:2022cv00017
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute: the pending #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is hereby DENIED AS MOOT, and the fee waived. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/9/2022. (copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
February 8, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/3/2022. (nmm)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 2241 Packet)(copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2022: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:21-cv-03002. (nmm)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aric Stutler (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/31/2022.]
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Aric Stutler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/31/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stutler v. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aric Stutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?