Sierra v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Leonidas Sierra
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2022cv00105
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Filing 17 PARTIAL Filing fee: $ 264.20, receipt number WVNW003000 (nmm)
June 13, 2022 Filing 16 AMENDED FEDERAL TORTS CLAIM ACT COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Leonidas Sierra. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Administrative Remedy Docs, #3 BOP Health Services Clinical Encounter (SEALED), #4 Cover letter, #5 Envelope)(nmm) Modified on 6/13/2022 to SEAL attachment # 3 per JPB (nmm).
June 9, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S LETTER to Rosa Sierra returning Money Order received on this day due to over payment. (lmm)
June 8, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 ORDER. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/6/2022 (per usps website). (nmm)
June 6, 2022 Filing 13 INITIAL PARTIAL Filing fee: $ 45.80; ADDITIONAL PARTIAL filing fee: 40.00, receipt number WVNE017795 (nmm)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER from Deputy Clerk to Rosa Sierra returning Money Order received this day with no purchaser signature and incorrectly made payable to. (nmm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; plaintiff is directed to re-file his amended Complaint on the Court-approved form within twenty-eight (28) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 6/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 FTCA Complaint Form) (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/3/2022 to attach Complaint with case number on it) (nmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2022: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
June 2, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint, by Leonidas Sierra. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Amend, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 BOP Health Services Clinical Encounter in support of Amended Complaint (SEALED), #4 Notice of Motion, #5 Cover letter re: filing fee payments, #6 Envelope)(nmm) Modified on 6/2/2022 to Seal Attachment # 3 per JPB (nmm).
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER from Leonidas Sierra to Clerk advising of the status of the filing fee payment and requesting a Federal Tort Claims Act packet in order to file an Amended Complaint (FTCA packet sent this same day via US Mail). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/19/22 per USPS. (lmm)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S FIRST MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS MOTION: an initial partial filing fee of $45.80 shall be forwarded to the Financial Deputy Clerk. If the plaintiff fails to pay the initial filing fee within twenty-eight (28) days of the entry of this Order, the Court will DISMISS this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 5/16/2022. (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr; copy to Financial Deputy Clerk and Trustee Clerk at the Institution with Consent to Collection via us mail) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/25/2022 (per usps website). (nmm)
April 22, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
April 22, 2022 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Leonidas Sierra. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
April 22, 2022 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Leonidas Sierra. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(nmm)
April 22, 2022 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leonidas Sierra. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Leonidas Sierra. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Remedy docs, #2 Cover letter (Local Rules request being handled by K. Criswell), #3 Envelope)(nmm) Modified docket text re: LR request on 4/22/2022 (nmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonidas Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?