Skeens v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tom Skeens
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2022cv00289
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security/Social Security Administration, Attorney General and US Attorney for the Northern District of West Virginia served on 12/12/2022. (nmm)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT: the Court GRANTS #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Procced In Forma Pauperis, and GRANTS #3 the Request for Service of Process by United States Marshal. The Clerk of the Court SHALL issue the summons and send to the U.S. Marshal Service, who shall serve the summons and Complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 12/2/2022. (nmm)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Tom Skeens. (nmm)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tom Skeens. (nmm)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Tom Skeens. (Attachments: #1 Assignment of EAJA Fees, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skeens v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Skeens
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?