Worthy v. Ray
Petitioner: Hasan Worthy
Respondent: Warden Ray
Case Number: 5:2023cv00032
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNW003186 (lmm)
February 8, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice #2 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/4/23 available for pickup per USPS. (lmm)
February 2, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (ag)(pro se PET cm rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
February 2, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 2241 forms, IFP & PTAR)(ag)(pro se PET cm rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2023: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
February 2, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Ray, filed by Hasan Worthy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - copy of Indictment District of Maine Crim. No. 2:12-cr-135, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet District of Maine Crim. No. 2:12-cr-135, #3 Envelope)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worthy v. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hasan Worthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?