Rowe v. Ballard
Defendant: David Ballard
Petitioner: David Allen Rowe
Case Number: 1:2007cv00283
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Bluefield Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: David A. Faber
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the court OVERRULES petitioner's objections to Magistrate Judge VanDervort's PF&R. The court ADOPTS the 94 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge VanDervort, GRANTS respondent's 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment, DENIES petitioner's 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment, DISMISSES petitioner's 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and DISMISSES this matter from the court's active docket. The court DENIES a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge David A. Faber on 11/7/2014. (cc: counsel of record) (mjp)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING 18 the Proposed Findings and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort; DENYING 15 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by David Allen Rowe; and REFERRING this matter back to Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort for further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 6/8/2009. (cc: Plaintiff, Pro Se and counsel of record) (arb)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort RECOMMENDING that the District Court DENY 15 Petitioner's MOTION WITH MEMO IN SUPPORT for Partial Summary Judgment and refer this matter back to Magistrate Judge VanDervort for further proceedings. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 5/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 4/20/2009. (cc: Petitioner, Pro Se) (arb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ballard
Represented By: R. Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Allen Rowe
Represented By: Thomas J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?