McCoy et al v. Southern Energy Homes, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wanda McCoy, Christopher Justice and Melinda Justice
Defendant: Southern Energy Homes, Inc., J.E.B. Quality Homes, Inc. and Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv01271
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Bluefield Office
County: McDowell
Presiding Judge: David A. Faber
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court GRANTS The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation's 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment and DENIES Plaintiffs' 122 MOTION for Relief from 118 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 4/23/2012. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot Defendant Southern Energy Homes, Inc.'s 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 10/11/2011. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part the 27 MOTION to Dismiss by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation ("BNY"). The court GRANTS BNY's Motion to Dismiss Counts Four, Five and Six of the First Amended Complaint. Counts Ten and Eleven are also DISMISSED. The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED in all other respects. The court also DENIES BNY's 31 MOTION to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 9/28/2011. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy et al v. Southern Energy Homes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda McCoy
Represented By: Cameron S. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Justice
Represented By: Cameron S. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Justice
Represented By: Cameron S. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Energy Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Stemple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E.B. Quality Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas P. Mooney, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?