Whittaker v. Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Austin Whittaker
Defendant: Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01482
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 2/15/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 8/15/2019, and all depositions by 10/30/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 8/30/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 9/30/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 10/13/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 11/14/2019, with responses and replies due thereafter in accordance with the Local Rules. Mediation to be concluded by 9/20/2019. Settlement Meeting to be held by 11/19/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 11/26/2019, with responses due by 12/3/2019. Plaintiff's portion of the Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order to defendant by 11/22/2019, who shall then prepare and complete the opposing portion thereof and submit the Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order to the Court for entry by 11/29/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 02:30 PM in Bluefield before Judge David A. Faber. Proposed Jury Charge due by 1/3/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 10:30 AM on 1/7/2020 in Bluefield. Jury Trial set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Bluefield before Judge David A. Faber. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 1/7/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 1/16/2019 at 1:30 PM is CANCELLED. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 1/7/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company for First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents. (Kesner, Tanya)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company, Austin Whittaker (Kesner, Tanya) (Modified on 1/7/2019 to add party filer) (ts).
December 21, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information by Chase Lawson Farmer appearing on behalf of Austin Whittaker. ERROR: Image did not contain signature of counsel. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Chase Lawson Farmer appearing on behalf of Austin Whittaker. (Farmer, Chase) (Modified on 12/21/2018 to replace unsigned image) (ts).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Last day for Rule 26(f) is Meeting is 1/3/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting is 1/10/2019. Scheduling Conference at 01:30 PM on 1/16/2019 in Charleston before the undersigned. Entry of Scheduling Order by 1/24/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures is 2/4/2019. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 12/4/2018. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company.(Kesner, Tanya) (Modified on 12/3/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (ts).
November 30, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
November 30, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Standing Order. ERROR: Image omitted. CORRECTION: Image attached; #2 Standing Order In Re: Assignment and Referral of Civil Actions and Matters to Magistrate Judges entered January 4, 2016. ERROR: Incomplete Image. CORRECTION: Complete image added and image replaced. (mk) (Modified on 12/3/2018 to correct link) (slr).
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk) (Modified on 11/30/2018 to add complete image) (mk).
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Mercer County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #CHAR015186. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mk) (Modified on 11/30/2018 to add Receipt): #3 Receipt) (mk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittaker v. Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Shawn C. Gillispie
Represented By: Tanya M. Kesner
Represented By: Brent K. Kesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Whittaker
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: Brian E. Bigelow
Represented By: Chase Lawson Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?