Dawson v. Musselman
Plaintiff: Justin Dawson
Defendant: Mark Musselman
Case Number: 1:2018cv01509
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Notice of Change of Attorney Information by Kayla Stickley Reynolds appearing on behalf of Mark Musselman. ERROR: Incorrect form used. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Kayla Stickley Reynolds appearing on behalf of Mark Musselman. (Reynolds, Kayla) (Modified on 1/17/2019 to replace image and to convert event to notice of change of attorney information) (ts)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/8/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/15/2019. Scheduling Conference at 02:30 PM on 2/26/2019 in Bluefield. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/1/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/11/2019. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 1/9/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Mark Musselman.(Cyrus, Dwayne)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Mark Musselman. Mark Musselman served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. Summons served on Mark Musselman. (Foster, Jason) (Modified on 1/3/2019 to convert event to summons returned executed by personal service and to remove link to #2 electronic summons issued) (ts).
December 12, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Justin Dawson (Foster, Jason)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Musselman re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (arb)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6993829. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Musselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Dawson
Represented By: Jason P. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Musselman
Represented By: Dwayne E. Cyrus
Represented By: Kayla Stickley Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?