Quinones-Cedeno v. Staff FCI McDowell
Plaintiff: Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno
Defendant: Staff FCI McDowell
Case Number: 1:2019cv00064
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS UPDATE by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno re: IFP Application. (arb)
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS UPDATE by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno re: IFP Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (mk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER RESPONSE to Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno, from Clerk, USDC, dated 3/6/2019, enclosing a form Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs for his completion (arb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER to USDC, Attn: Rory L. Perry, from Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno, dated 3/4/2019, advising his Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees has been lost and requesting the Court provide him with another form Application (arb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 Documentation by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno in Further Support of his #10 Amended Complaint. (arb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 Documentation by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno in Support of his #10 Amended Complaint. (arb)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 LETTER-FORM MOTION for Extension of Time to File Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Plaintiff is directed to either pay the filing fee and administrative fee or file an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by 3/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/1/2019. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (arb)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER-MOTION by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno to Extend Time to File his Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (arb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno against Staff FCI McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Mailing Envelope) (mk)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court DENIES as moot Plaintiff's second #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 2/25/2019. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (arb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno to Extend Time to Amend #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Mailing Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (mk)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 LETTER-FORM MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint by 3/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 2/12/2019. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (arb)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On 2/11/2019, Plaintiff filed a letter-form #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Exhibits. The undersigned notes that one Exhibit is marked as sensitive & confidential." It is hereby ORDERED that the Exhibit marked sensitive & confidential shall be filed under SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 2/11/2019. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (mk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER-FORM MOTION by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Sealed Exhibit 3, #4 Mailing Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (mk) (Modified on 2/11/2019 to seal exhibit #3 pursuant to #6 Order) (mk).
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER-FORM MOTION by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno to Extend Time to Amend #1 Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (mk)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re: #1 Letter-Form Complaint: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either pay the filing and administrative fee totaling $400 or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 2/28/2019. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff has until 2/28/2019, to amend his Complaint to specifically set forth his constitutional claims and state specific facts as to how each defendant violated his constitutional rights. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 1/29/2019. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se, with Bivens Form Complaint and IFP Application) (mk)
January 25, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 LETTER-FORM COMPLAINT. (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones-Cedeno v. Staff FCI McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff FCI McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?