Lawson v. F.C.I. McDowell Warden

Petitioner: Dustin C. Lawson
Respondent: F.C.I. McDowell Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00364
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #4 Dismiss and Transfer 28 U.S.C. 2241 Petition by Dustin C. Lawson. (mk) (#1 Exhibits 1-6, #2 Envelope) (mk). (Modified on 6/12/2019 to add attachments) (mk).
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Dustin C. Lawson to Supplement and Amend #1 Habeas Corpus 28 USC 2241 (mk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION by Dustin C. Lawson to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter re: Delay in Mail and Envelope) (mk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number CHAR015924. (slr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION: It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the presiding District Judge DISMISS the petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) and this civil action for lack of jurisdiction. Alternatively, the undersigned proposes that the presiding District Judge construe this petition as a Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 and TRANSFER it to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, where it could have been brought. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 5/28/2019. (cc: Petitioner) (mk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
May 8, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee (arb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS/MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by Dustin C. Lawson against F.C.I. McDowell Warden pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. F.C.I. McDowell Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dustin C. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F.C.I. McDowell Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?