Stone v. Cushua

Plaintiff: Robert W. Stone
Defendant: U.S. Parole Commission and Patricia K. Cushua
Case Number: 1:2019cv00380
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiff's #6 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is deficient. Plaintiff shall have 20 days from the date of the entry of this Order to either pay the Court's filing fee ($350) and administrative fee ($50) totaling $400 or obtain approval to proceed in forma pauperis or without prepayment of fees. Failure of Plaintiff to comply with these directives will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this matter without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/25/2019. (cc: plaintiff with a Form Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Authorization to Release Institutional Account Information and to Pay Filing Fee) (arb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Robert W. Stone against Patricia K. Cushua. (arb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION by Robert W. Stone to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (arb)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either pay the filing and administrative fee totaling $400 or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 6/14/2019. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff has until 6/14/2019, to amend his Complaint to specifically set forth his constitutional claims and state specific facts as to how each defendant violated his constitutional rights. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 5/15/2019. (cc: Plaintiff, w/Form Complaint and IFP Application) (mk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/NOTICE of Robert Stone, dated 10/15/2018, re: Parole Qualification (arb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 FINAL NOTICE by Robert W. Stone of Criminal Complaint/Involuntary Bankruptcy (arb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT (Attachment: #1 Proof of Service & Mailing Envelope) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Cushua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Parole Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia K. Cushua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?