Brown v. Social Security

Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Defendant: Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00446
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's response to #6 MOTION by Social Security to Dismiss With Prejudice or, in the Alternative, MOTION by Social Security for a More Definite Statement be filed with the Clerk on or before 8/5/2019. Following service of Plaintiff's response, Defendant will have seven (7) business days within which to reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/22/2019. (cc: Plaintiff; counsel of record) (mk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Social Security in support of #6 MOTION by Social Security to Dismiss Complaint, or, in the Alternative, MOTION for a More Definite Statement (Mankins, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Social Security to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal, or, in the Alternative, MOTION for a More Definite Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn.(Mankins, Jennifer) (Modified on 7/22/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET SHEET and COURT RECORDS from Mercer County Magistrate Court. (mk)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Defendant's #3 MOTION to Clarify Response Time: The Court ORDERS the Defendant to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/13/2019. (cc: Plaintiff; counsel of record) (mk)
June 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Clarify Response Time by Social Security (Mankins, Jennifer) (Modified on 6/13/2019 to convert event to a motion) (mk).
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Social Security with summons, complaint and other miscellaneous documents from Magistrate Court of Mercer County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?