Shorter v. Saul

Plaintiff: Brenda Gail Shorter
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00464
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held before the Administrative Law Judge. (Attachments: #1 002 Court Transcript Index, #2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 1, #3 004 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 2, #4 005 Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 006 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 1, #6 007 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices Part 2, #7 008 Non Disability Related Development, #8 009 Disability Related Development Part 1, #9 010 Disability Related Development Part 2, #10 011 Medical Records Part 1, #11 012 Medical Records Part 2, #12 013 Medical Records Part 3, #13 014 Medical Records Part 4)(Neil, Gregory)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #2 Complaint by Andrew Saul.(Neil, Gregory)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Brenda Gail Shorter for service upon Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Andrew Saul served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. Person Served: Vicky Dickerson. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 6/25/2019. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 6/24/2019. (Dils, Jan)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE: Replaced defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Social Security Commissioner with Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and updated case title. (mwk) (ADI)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mk)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS AND FEES: The Clerk of the Court shall issue the summonses; the Plaintiff shall serve the summonses and Complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; that the recovery, if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs and fees taxed against the plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and her attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 6/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (mk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 18, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (mk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Brenda Gail Shorter to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shorter v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Gail Shorter
Represented By: Jan Dils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Represented By: Gregory P. Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?