Worrell v. Delta Express Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Worrell
Defendant: Delta Express Services, Inc. and Roderick B. Billingslea
Case Number: 1:2019cv00498
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 10/3/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 2/5/2020, and all depositions by 3/23/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 1/23/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 2/24/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 3/29/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 4/13/2020, with responses and replies due thereafter in accordance with the Local Rules. Mediation to be concluded by 4/22/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 6/22/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 6/29/2020, with responses due by 7/6/2020. Plaintiff's portion of the Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due to defendants by 7/1/2020, who shall then prepare and complete the opposing portion thereof and submit the Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order to the Court for entry by 7/8/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 02:00 PM in Bluefield before Judge David A. Faber. Proposed Jury Charge due by 7/23/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 8/3/2020 in Bluefield. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Bluefield before Judge David A. Faber. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 8/20/2019. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (arb)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 9/3/2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 8/20/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (arb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Roderick B. Billingslea, Delta Express Services, Inc., Teresa Worrell. (Tyree, Unaiza) (Modified on 8/20/2019 to add party filer)(ts).
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roderick B. Billingslea, Delta Express Services, Inc. for First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff. (Tyree, Unaiza)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Delta Express Services, Inc. for Answers to Plaintiffs Amended Interrogatories. (Tyree, Unaiza)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting is 8/14/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting is 8/21/2019. Scheduling Conference at 02:00 PM on 9/3/2019 in Bluefield before the undersigned. Entry of Scheduling Order by 9/4/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures is 9/13/2019. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 7/15/2019. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Delta Express Services, Inc. (Tyree, Unaiza)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Roderick B. Billingslea.(Tyree, Unaiza)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by William B. Flanigan updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Teresa Worrell. (Flanigan, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 7/11/2019 to remove blank image; refiled at ECF No. 4)(ts).
July 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Express Services, Inc. and Roderick B. Billingslea. ERROR: Civil Cover Sheet was omitted from filing. CORRECTION: Civil Cover Sheet added (slr). (slr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Express Services, Inc. and Roderick B. Billingslea with summons, complaint, amended complaint, docket sheet and miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Mercer County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7309244. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worrell v. Delta Express Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Express Services, Inc.
Represented By: Unaiza Riaz Tyree
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick B. Billingslea
Represented By: Unaiza Riaz Tyree
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Worrell
Represented By: William B. Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?