Johnson v. Reherman
Petitioner: Ednecdia Sutina Johnson
Respondent: Warden Reherman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00596
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas (2241): Respondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the Petition within 60 days of the entry of this Order showing cause, if he has any, why the relief should not be granted. Petitioner may file a Reply to the Answer within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/10/2019. (cc: Petitioner; USA w/2241 Petition) (arb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 1BLUE001607. (arb)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Petitioner shall have 30 days of the date of this Order to either pay the requisite $5.00 filing fee or submit to the Court an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. No action will occur on her petition until she complies with this Order. Failure to comply shall result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/27/2019. (cc: Petitioner w/second Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (arb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 15, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee. (mk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Ednecdia Sutina Johnson against Warden Reherman pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits in Support, #2 Envelope) (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Reherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ednecdia Sutina Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Reherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?