Cline v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ricky Cline
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00544
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Ricky Cline for service re: #5 Summons upon Andrew Saul, Andrew Saul served on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. Person Served: U.S. Attorney for the So. District, V. Dickerson. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 9/24/2020. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attorney General-Return, #2 US Attorney-Return) (mk)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing counsel to file with the court a pleading certifying whether Dr. Kropac is or is not involved in this matter by 9/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 8/18/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mk)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Ricky Cline for Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 60 days. Original Summons and 1 copy mailed to USM for service. (Attachments: #1 USM-285-Commissioner, #2 USM-28-US Atty, #3 USM-285-Atty General of US) (mk)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING #1 IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The applicant is hereby permitted to proceed without prepayment of costs of fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. The Clerk of the Court shall issue the summons(es). The United States Marshal's Service shall serve the summons(es) and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 8/18/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mk)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 17, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (mk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Ricky Cline to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cline v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?