Alshurafa v. Wimbish et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Alshurafa and Tracy Ahmad Alshurafa
Defendant: FCI McDowell, Lt. Johnson, Lt. Connelly and Captain Wimbish
Case Number: 1:2020cv00546
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is ORDERED that a copy of Plaintiff's #6 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs be mailed to the officer at FCI McDowell having responsibility for administering prisoner accounts. The officer at FCI McDowell is ORDERED to complete the Certificate portion at the end of Plaintiff's Application and return such to this Court on or before 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 9/28/2020. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se and Trustee Officer, FCI McDowell) (arb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION by Tracy Ahmad Alshurafa to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (Attachment: #1 Documentation in Support) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (arb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Tracy Ahmad Alshurafa against Captain Wimbish, Lt. Connelly and Lt. Johnson. (arb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER to Clerk, U. S. District Court, from Tracy Alshurafa, dated 9/15/2020, re: IFP application and administrative remedies; requesting another IFP application; copy of second IFP application provided (arb)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re: Plaintiff's #1 Complaint: Plaintiff shall either pay the filing and administrative fee totaling $400 or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 9/18/2020. Plaintiff has until 9/18/2020 to amend his Complaint to specifically set forth his constitutional claims and state specific facts as to how each defendant violated his constitutional rights. Failure to comply with the aforementioned directives will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this matter without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 8/18/2020. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se w/form Complaint and blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) (arb)
August 17, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alshurafa v. Wimbish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Alshurafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Ahmad Alshurafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Wimbish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?