Jennings v. FCI McDowell et al
Petitioner: Brandon Marquis Jennings and Mustafa Beezy Bey
Respondent: FCI McDowell and United States Marshal
Case Number: 1:2020cv00685
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:20-hc-02192. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - The court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/15/2020. Copy of order sent to petitioner via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for petition review. (Poole, A) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. FCI McDowell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon Marquis Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mustafa Beezy Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?