Salazar v. Carver et al
Plaintiff: Sue Salazar
Defendant: Warden Carver and BOP Director Carvajal
Case Number: 1:2021cv00531
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #2 MOTION Requesting Class Certification Pursuant to to Certify Class 23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 9/30/2021. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (mk)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Court DENY Plaintiff's #1 , pp. 3-4, MOTION Requesting Waiving Exhaustion, DENY Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to 65(b), DISMISS Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, and remove this matter from the Court's docket. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. If the PF&R was served electronically, Objections are due by 10/14/2021. If the PF&R was served by mail, Objections are due by 10/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 9/30/2021. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (mk)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION by Sue Salazar for Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to 65(b) (mk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION by Sue Salazar Requesting Class Certification Pursuant to 23 (mk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar v. Carver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOP Director Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?