Parks v. Napier
Petitioner: Donna N. Parks and Nikki
Respondent: A. W. Napier
Case Number: 1:2021cv00610
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Referring Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Petitioner to file a reply to Respondent's #7 Response to Order to Show Cause within sixty (60) days after service of same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/6/2022. (cc: Petitioner; counsel of record) (arb)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by A. W. Napier (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lindsay, Matthew)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Respondent to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 within 60 days of the entry of this Order; Petitioner may file a reply within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/14/2021. (cc: Petitioner, USA w/2241 Petition) (mk)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 1BLUE001897. (arb)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Petitioner, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, to either pay the requisite five dollar filing fee or submit to the Court an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 12/9/2021. (cc: Petitioner w/second Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (arb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER OF FAILURE TO REMIT FILING FEE (mk)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Donna N. Parks against A. W. Napier pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donna N. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nikki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. W. Napier
Represented By: Matthew C. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?