Neuman v. Mercer County, WV Prosecuting Attorney's Office
Plaintiff: Mark S. Neuman
Defendant: Mercer County, West Virginia Prosecuting Attorney's Office
Case Number: 1:2022cv00280
Filed: July 9, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER. Pursuant to #4 Order, the referral of this civil action for discovery matters is transferred from Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 7/13/2022. (cc: Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn; Magistrate Judge Tinsley; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing that this action be transferred to Rory L. Perry, II, Clerk of Court, for reassignment to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/13/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mk)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mercer County, West Virginia Prosecuting Attorney's Office re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (arb)
July 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8225598. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Mercer County, WV Prosecuting Attorney's Office) (arb)
July 9, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neuman v. Mercer County, WV Prosecuting Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S. Neuman
Represented By: Dana Paul McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercer County, West Virginia Prosecuting Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?