Noble et al v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: William Noble and Robert Boyd
Defendant: Officer Christopher Chad Butler, Officer Brandon Charette and The City of Princeton, WV
Case Number: 1:2022cv00400
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Christopher Chad Butler, Brandon Charette, The City of Princton, WV to answer to December 13, 2022 re: #1 Complaint by Christopher Chad Butler, Brandon Charette, The City of Princeton, WV, William Noble, Robert Boyd (Underwood, Jared) (Modified on 11/17/2022 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filers) (mk).
October 26, 2022 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE for Christopher Chad Butler, Brandon Charette and The City of Princeton, WV to 11/28/2022 pursuant to #9 Stipulation. (mk)
October 26, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Christopher Chad Butler, Brandon Charette, The City of Princeton, WV to answer #1 Complaint to November 28, 2022 by Christopher Chad Butler, Brandon Charette, The City of Princeton, WV, William Noble, Robert Boyd (Underwood, Jared) (Modified on 10/27/2022 to add party filer) (mk).
October 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jared C. Underwood on behalf of Christopher Chad Butler, Brandon Charette, The City of Princeton, WV. (Underwood, Jared)
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service upon The City of Princeton, WV re: #1 Complaint. Person served: Brian Blankenship. (Attachment: #1 Summons)(Crimmel, Matthew) (Modified on 10/24/2022 to add link to #1 complaint)(mk).
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service upon Brandon Charette re: #1 Complaint. Brandon Charette served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. Person Served: T. A. Gray. (Attachment: #1 Summons)(Crimmel, Matthew) (Modified on 10/24/2022 to add link to #1 complaint and to add answer deadline to docket text) (mk).
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service upon Christopher Chad Butler re: #1 Complaint. Christopher Chad Butler served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. Person served: T. A. Gray. (Attachment: #1 Summons)(Crimmel, Matthew) (Modified on 10/24/2022 to add link to #1 complaint and to add answer deadline to docket text)(mk).
October 21, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: Summonses Returned Executed by Personal Service for All Defendants. ERROR: Multiple returns filed. CORRECTION: Image removed; counsel to refile separately. (mk)
October 20, 2022 Filing 4 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 10/21/2022 to remove image filed; counsel to refile separately)(mk).
September 21, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Chad Butler, Brandon Charette and The City of Princeton, WV re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Charette Summons, #2 The City of Princeton, WV Summons) (arb)
September 21, 2022 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8272889. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Butler, #3 Proposed Summons - Charette, #4 Proposed Summons - The City of Princeton, WV) (arb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble et al v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Noble
Represented By: Matthew P. Crimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Boyd
Represented By: Matthew P. Crimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Christopher Chad Butler
Represented By: Jared C. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Brandon Charette
Represented By: Jared C. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Princeton, WV
Represented By: Jared C. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?