Harris v. Norfolk Southern Railway Corp.
Plaintiff: Charles Eugene Harris
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Corp.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00497
Filed: July 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
County: Mingo
Presiding Judge: Joseph R. Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 498 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company's 497 MOTION Regarding the Scope of Remand; directing that the new trial in this matter will encompass both liability and compensatory damages. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/3/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmh)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the parties' 447 JOINT MOTION for Continuance of Phase Two Trial and the trial is continued; the court will hold a status conference in this matter on 4/16/2031 at 1:30 p.m., in Charleston, West Vir ginia; lead counsel and any unrepresented parties to appear fully prepared to discuss all aspects of the case, including the scheduling of a trial date; individuals with full authority to settle the case to be present in person; denying the parties' 201 , 218 , 232 , 234 , 317 , 318 , 321 , 410 , 411 MOTIONS in Limine. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/18/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 446 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting plaintiff's 432 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment and denying defendant's 434 MOTION for New Trial. The captioned name of the defendant is hereby AMENDED to "Norfolk Southern Railway Company. " The 419 Judgment Order is amended to add the amount of $39,224.52 in prejudgment interest. To the extent that the plaintiff also moves for a new trial on the issue of punitive damages, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/8/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 380 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Norfolk Southern Railway Company's 264 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to its claims for express indemnification and defense from Cobra; denying Norfolk Southern Railway Company's 319 MOTION for Summary Judgment relating to the 1989 Siding Agreement and 2008 Lease; granting in part and denying in part Cobra Natural Resources, LLC's 268 MOTION for Summary Judgment; for purposes of trial and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedur e 42(b), the court BIFURCATES Norfolk Southern Railway Company's indemnification claim against Cobra from Harris's negligence claim against Norfolk Southern Railway Company; the first phase of the trial will be limited to the plaintiff 's negligence claim and the second phase of the trial will address NSRC's indemnification claim; the jury will only be advised of the indemnification issue when and if necessary. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/13/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Norfolk Southern Railway Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Eugene Harris
Represented By: Tonya L. Hatfield
Represented By: Bruce E. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Corp.
Represented By: Angela W. Konrad
Represented By: T. Matthew Lockhart
Represented By: John H. Mahaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?