Young et al v. Apogee Coal Company LLC et al

Plaintiff: Gina Young and Richard Young, Jr.
Defendant: James Ray Browning, Patriot Coal, Inc. and Apogee Coal Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv01324
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Joseph R. Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying defendant's 89 MOTION to Dismiss 86 Second Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment; denying plaintiffs' 87 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count 5 of Plaintiffs' Sec ond Amended Complaint; denying plaintiffs' 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count Six of the Amended Complaint; reaffirming the court's decision to bifurcate Counts One through Four from Counts Five and Six; lifting the stay on further proceedings in connection with Counts One through Four; staying further proceedings in connection with Counts Five and Six pending resolution of Counts One through Four. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/21/2015. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (tmh)
January 5, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' 51 JOINT MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Claims; the court BIFURCATES Counts 1-4 from Counts 5 and 6 of the plaintiffs' 56 First Amended Complaint and STAYS further proceedings in connection with Counts 1-4 pending resolution of Counts 5 and 6, the declaratory judgment counts; directing, effective 7/3/2012 that the Clerk reflect this action to have been retired to the inactive docket as of 7/3/2012 and reinstated to the active docket on 3/10/2014. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/5/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
May 13, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 26 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/13/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. Apogee Coal Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Young
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Conaway
Represented By: Timothy R. Conaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Young, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Conaway
Represented By: Timothy R. Conaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ray Browning
Represented By: Christopher A. Brumley
Represented By: Joshua Charles Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Coal, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Brumley
Represented By: Joshua Charles Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apogee Coal Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Brumley
Represented By: Joshua Charles Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?