Freeland v. Ballard et al

Plaintiff: Eli Wayne Freeland
Defendant: David Ballard, Russell Matheney, Jeff Hilewitz, Brian Fernandez, Daniel Hahn and Michael Bunch
Case Number: 2:2012cv08712
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Thomas E. Johnston
Referring Judge: Dwane L. Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; the Court sustains the 149 Objections; the Court declines to adopt 146 Proposed Findings and Recommendations; denying Defendant's 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment; directing Plaintiff to retain counsel, if he is going to do so, within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum Opinion and Order; denying as moot Plaintiff's 148 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/28/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
August 26, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting the 97 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION; denying Plaintiff's 49 for Preliminary Injunction and/or MOTION for Protective Order, 53 for Summary Judgment/or Default Judgment, and 91 for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/26/2014. (cc: plaintiff; attys; any unrepresented party) (tmh)
March 13, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 16 MOTION to Dismiss; granting said motion to the extent that defendants have been sued for monetary damages in their official capacities and concerning plaintiff's supervisory liability claims against defendants Matheny and Ballard; and otherwise denying said motion. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 3/13/2014. (cc: plaintiff; attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeland v. Ballard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Wayne Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ballard
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: James W. Marshall, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Matheney
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: James W. Marshall, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Hilewitz
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: James W. Marshall, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fernandez
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: James W. Marshall, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hahn
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: James W. Marshall, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bunch
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: James W. Marshall, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?